Financial history BLACK SOUTH WEST NETWORK

Charity number: 1123633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £350.41k £840.00k £1.08m £1.55m £1.93m
Total expenditure £246.89k £538.59k £614.92k £879.86k £1.60m
Income from government contracts N/A £232.70k £128.90k £281.14k £21.28k
Income from government grants £168.53k £72.71k £120.00k £74.89k £421.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £6.60k £20.11k £143.22k £128.22k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £119.44k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £713.97k £817.44k £1.30m £1.64m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £170.07k £106.06k £153.98k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £529.67k £614.01k £878.53k £1.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £8.92k £908 £1.33k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0