SERO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for Julia's House, Dorset Children's Hospice and for other local causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 26 February 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE EDWINA LITTLE | Chair | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ann Partridge | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Seymour-Rees | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Woods | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA JONES | Trustee | 10 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ANN PRIOR | Trustee | 28 December 2012 |
|
|||||
VANESSA JANE DAWSON | Trustee | 28 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE LESLEY CLARK | Trustee | 28 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Dawson | Trustee | 25 June 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.05k | £432 | £5.81k | £6.27k | £7.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.76k | £1.60k | £4.80k | £7.15k | £6.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN DORSET (2) FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY IN THE LOCAL AREA OR TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE GROUP SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Olivers Mead
Child Okeford
Blandford Forum
DT11 8HT
- Phone:
- 01258860750
- Email:
- veecom@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window