MERSEYSIDE JEWISH COMMUNITY CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Merseyside Jewish Community Care aims to provide a comprehensive welfare service for Jewish individuals and families in Merseyside, and organisations and professionals who interact with the Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 21 February 2008: Standard registration
- 16 February 2016: Funds received from 236795 MAURICE MYERS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Blumenow | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ross | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Beaver | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Sapiro | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Harris | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Laurence Shiffman | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rosen | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael Fraenkel | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE MYLES LEE | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|||||
GORDON SHERR GLOBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £356.77k | £368.66k | £541.82k | £398.84k | £276.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396.83k | £377.98k | £341.04k | £392.47k | £351.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £421.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £16.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £31.94k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £72.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £299.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £300.70k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £40.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £5.28k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £8.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 24 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE ASSISTANCE OF JEWISH PEOPLE IN MERSEYSIDE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS, SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY OR OLD AGE; AND 2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH OF JEWISH PEOPLE IN MERSEYSIDE BY THE PROVISION OF GOODS, SERVICES, SUPPORT AND ADVICE. (THE WORDS "JEWISH" AND "MERSEYSIDE" SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DECIDED BY THE CHARITY ACCORDING TO THE INDIVIDUAL CIRCUMSTANCES AND AT ITS ABSOLUTE AND UNFETTERED DISCRETION.)
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHIFRIN HOUSE
433 SMITHDOWN ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L15 3JL
- Phone:
- 01517332292
- Email:
- info@mjccshifrin.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window