MIDDLESEX SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Consider applications for grants/awards from registered charities whose activities and ambitions match the objectives of the Foundation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 May 2007: Standard registration
- WAVELL WAKEFIELD AND MIDDLESEX SPORTS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- WAVELL WAKEFIELD AND MIDDLESEX TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH REES KC | Chair | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Neale | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Latter | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steve Rac | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charles Sinclair Portsmouth | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Grainger MBE | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Summers | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Hornby | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Karena Vleck | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.25k | £46.83k | £78.61k | £51.51k | £57.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.28k | £10.50k | £11.00k | £39.50k | £63.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13/04/2007 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 14/03/2012
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ("THE OBJECTS") ARE (I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF SPORT (INCLUDING RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL AND OTHER GAMES AND SPORTS) AND RECREATION; (II) TO RELIEVE AND PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF DISABLED AND INJURED SPORTSMEN AND SPORTSWOMEN; (III) TO PROMOTE OR PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS (INCLUDING THE PLAYING OF RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL AND OTHER GAMES AND SPORTS) OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (IV) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
127 Lisbon Avenue
TWICKENHAM
TW2 5HL
- Phone:
- 07949 058618
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window