Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) CHAPEL OF HIS GLORY BRADFORD

Charity number: 1120162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £124.83k £97.59k £126.53k £207.16k £366.16k
Total expenditure £85.66k £46.36k £86.61k £110.00k £150.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.39k £5.50k N/A N/A N/A