Trustees DOW GRADUATES ASSOCIATION OF NORTHERN EUROPE (DOGANE)
Charity number: 1126068

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SHAHED QURAISHI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Khurram Mustafa | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nadia Badr | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Imran Ghanghro | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Adeel Siddiqui | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shabi Ahmad | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Saqib Ghani | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Syed Iftikhar | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
UMAR DARAZ KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR SHAHABULLAH QURASHI | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.