Financial history FLECKNEY HISTORY GROUP

Charity number: 1119659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £1.62k £614 £1.25k £1.32k £1.43k
Total expenditure £1.86k £466 £1.04k £1.33k £1.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A