WILTSHIRE BLIND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wiltshire Sight exists to reduce the impact of sight loss, providing local services to enable Blind and Partially-Sighted people in Wiltshire and Swindon to lead fulfilling, independent lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,630 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
77 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 01 June 2007: Standard registration
- 07 December 2021: Funds received from 1038530 DEVIZES AND DISTRICT CLUB FOR THE BLIND AND PARTIA...
- WILTSHIRE SIGHT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Hall | Chair | 05 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Luke Hillman | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Stephens | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Stephens | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Grinham | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.96k | £203.99k | £389.49k | £188.45k | £133.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.94k | £131.63k | £219.56k | £230.54k | £228.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.02k | £6.93k | £4.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 01 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
ARE TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS LIVING IN WILTSHIRE AND SWINDON.
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE AND SWINDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Lucy's Sight Centre
Browfort
Bath Road
Devizes
Wiltshire
SN10 2AT
- Phone:
- 01380739113
- Email:
- info@wiltshiresight.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window