Financial history MENAI BRIDGE RAFT RUN CHARITY FUND

Charity Number: 1121383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.88k £72 £6.24k £9.01k £11.81k
Total expenditure £5.18k £199 £3.58k £6.88k £8.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A