THE PAIS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pais Project trains and equips gap year apprentices to carry out activities in schools and churches such as assemblies, clubs, classroom support and youth groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Rhys Miles | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Richard Buckley | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Thomas | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Thompson | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BAKER | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.81k | £124.25k | £59.56k | £74.13k | £88.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.43k | £117.65k | £64.30k | £65.65k | £92.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
(I) TO SEEK THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ANNEXED (II) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES (III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS AND ADULTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: NATIONALLY IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MICHAELS CHURCH
BUDBROOKE
WARWICK
CV35 8QL
- Phone:
- 01709818213
- Email:
- uk@paismovement.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window