Financial history WELLSPRING CHURCH (WATFORD)

Charity Number: 1119764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £651.14k £487.70k £755.24k £594.71k £637.75k
Total expenditure £593.28k £558.60k £441.42k £516.46k £584.25k
Income from government contracts £7.82k £2.09k £1.19k £1.15k £1.25k
Income from government grants £377 £26.24k £8.41k N/A £5.24k
Income - Donations and legacies £602.36k N/A £721.92k £533.08k £538.40k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £48.34k N/A £33.31k £60.27k £92.78k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £440 N/A £19 £1.36k £6.58k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £51.75k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £564.00k N/A £439.60k £514.07k £581.99k
Expenditure - Raising funds £29.28k N/A £1.82k £2.39k £2.25k
Expenditure - Governance £5.52k N/A £7.73k £4.07k £4.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £33.27k N/A £27.63k £38.97k £37.49k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0