Financial history THE FURNITURE PROJECT

Charity number: 1119360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £421.17k £311.49k £465.00k £440.91k £539.04k
Total expenditure £404.90k £347.14k £442.00k £439.24k £526.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £101.00k N/A N/A £20.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £74.35k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £464.69k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £526.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0