ASHBOURNE TAI CHI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer affordable weekly Tai Chi classes at Ashbourne Leisure Centre for those over 50 years or adult and disabled and also quarterly social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 06 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM ANDERTON | Chair | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Whitaker | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Midge Dobbs | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Purnell | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA KYLE | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Stubbs | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||
GEORGE UPSON | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/03/2020 | 24/03/2021 | 24/03/2022 | 24/03/2023 | 24/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80k | £1.25k | £4.47k | £4.44k | £5.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.59k | £731 | £4.22k | £4.46k | £5.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2022 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED AT A MEETING DATED 22 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE (1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE OLDER INHABITANTS AND DISABLED PEOPLE OF ASHBOURNE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILIT0IES FOR TAKING PART IN TAI CHI. (2) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE OLDER RESIDENTS AND DISABLED PEOPLE OF ASHBOURNE AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVES OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
ASHBOURNE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 The Plough
Old Hill
ASHBOURNE
Derbyshire
DE6 1BY
- Phone:
- 07392115889
- Email:
- mwa950@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window