Financial history Rotary International in Great Britain and Ireland Disaster Recovery Trust

Charity number: 1119688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £178.46k £8.56k £7.70k £212.33k £179.42k
Total expenditure £45.47k £130.10k £53.77k £10.61k £29.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A