Financial history ST MARY'S CENTRE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1122054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £150.03k £216.78k £405.93k £440.83k £692.10k
Total expenditure £113.72k £154.16k £214.26k £404.74k £516.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.10k £41.50k £43.26k £44.66k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £532.77k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £153.44k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.89k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £515.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £944
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0