Financial history THE ODYSSEY CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1120574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £575 £554 £0 £47.86k £2.49k
Total expenditure £0 £495 £928 £37.77k £37.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A