TORAH VOCHESED BUILDINGS LIMITED

Charity number: 1120430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide building facilities for educational institutions

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £135,000
Total expenditure: £150,069

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 August 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Solomon Klor Trustee 07 January 2019
TORAH VODAAS LIMITED
Received: On time
MIRIAM WEINSTEIN Trustee 22 January 2013
None on record
JONATHAN WEINSTEIN Trustee 22 January 2013
None on record
NOMI KLOR Trustee 22 January 2013
NORTH WEST HACHNOSAS KALLOH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £122.50k £116.41k £116.06k £102.75k £135.00k
Total expenditure £259.00k £107.85k £212.42k £167.30k £150.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 19 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 19 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 22 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
142 BRIDGE LANE
LONDON
NW11 9JS
Phone:
02084581451
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available