STAFFORD UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 12 July 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Benge | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dorothy WIlliams-Ashford | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henryk Smialowski | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Bright | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Millington | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Gillen | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Rowlands | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Braziel | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
June Williams | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN HOOD | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.37k | £16.94k | £44.56k | £95.71k | £112.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.99k | £18.23k | £39.83k | £96.70k | £107.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/03/2007 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 14 Mar 2022 as amended on 14 Mar 2022 as amended on 10 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE U3A ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
STAFFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 St. Johns Road
STAFFORD
ST17 9AS
- Phone:
- 01785244558
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window