Financial history HOPE 4 THE WORLD

Charity number: 1120879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £62.65k £55.50k £17.91k £67.22k £50.96k
Total expenditure £64.39k £30.65k £33.67k £54.89k £83.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A