HOPE 4 THE WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Within our areas of operation, we are building schools where none exist and training teachers for those schools, and training medics to provide basic medical services to their communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Burma
- Indonesia
- Thailand
Governance
- 17 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr FARIS HAZIM NASIR HUSSAIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Robert Richards | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Heyworth | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ngozi Lola Ogunsanya | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CHARLES CROUCH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.65k | £55.50k | £17.91k | £67.22k | £50.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.39k | £30.65k | £33.67k | £54.89k | £83.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- (A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN BURMA, THAILAND, INDONESIA, SUDAN AND IN IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF EXPERTISE TRAINING AND FUNDING FOR ESTABLISHING MICRO-ENTERPRISE IN ANY OF THE SAID LOCATIONS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND IN THE SAID LOCATIONS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
BURMA, THAILAND, INDOESIA, SUDAN AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 CATFORD BROADWAY
CATFORD
LONDON
SE6 4SN
- Phone:
- 01689869038
- Email:
- admin@hope4theworld.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window