Financial history THE FRIENDS OF SAINT STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS BLACKPOOL

Charity Number: 1120454
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.30k £15.30k £18.75k £21.64k £17.34k
Total expenditure £74.12k £31.30k £31.17k £30.67k £25.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A