Trustees THE FRIENDS OF SAINT STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS BLACKPOOL
Charity Number: 1120454

Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew James Teather | Chair | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Berry | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Whitehead | Trustee | 21 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Audrey McLennan | Trustee | 21 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keith McLennan | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Walter John Cairns | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GREEN | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY GRAHAM | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|||||
IAN BUTTERWORTH | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.