Financial history MISSION POSSIBLE UK

Charity Number: 1120971
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £266.24k £208.12k £299.21k £200.30k £181.88k
Total expenditure £178.74k £244.87k £252.89k £216.11k £332.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A