Financial history JUNE HANCOCK MESOTHELIOMA RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 1121784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £289.27k £52.65k £93.70k £46.42k £54.13k
Total expenditure £2.98k £1.83k £57.23k £604.13k £3.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A