Trustees DE NEDERLANDSE REGENBOOG SCHOOL

Charity number: 1121703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sylvia Hazenbroek Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Dorien Brouwers Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
David Maenaut Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Gerrit Froon Trustee 08 June 2024
None on record
Bianca Refualu Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Laurens Steenbergen Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Mattheus Wijnand de Vree Trustee 31 October 2020
None on record
Frank t' Sas Trustee 23 June 2018
None on record