Financial history LINCOLNSHIRE BUSINESSES FOR BREAKFAST

Charity number: 1121348
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £18.80k £33.28k £42.82k £17.71k £9.36k
Total expenditure £29.03k £41.35k £45.48k £16.27k £20.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A