Financial history CONSTABLE COUNTRY CHILDCARE

Charity number: 1122021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £926.24k £876.85k £1.05m £1.29m £1.77m
Total expenditure £786.42k £763.54k £928.64k £1.11m £1.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £389.03k £441.01k £418.57k £492.95k £590.24k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.18k £527 £0 £4.91k £16.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £924.03k £876.32k £1.05m £1.29m £1.74m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.04k £0 £0 £0 £16.99k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £501 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £786.42k £763.54k £928.64k £1.11m £1.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £64.81k £75.35k £108.46k £115.76k £118.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0