CHORLEY PALS MEMORIAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and foster good citizenship for the benefit of the public at large in particular by: The provision of a memorial or memorials within the boundaries of the Borough of Chorley to perpetuate the memory of the Chorley Pals (The men from the town and surrounding villages who fought in World War One as 'Y' Coy. of the 11th [Service] Battalion [Accrington] East Lancashire Regiment).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 28 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt. Hon. Sir LINDSAY HOYLE MP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Councillor Beverley MURRAY MBE | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
STUART ANTHONY CLEWLOW | Trustee | 19 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ANDREW ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN PENLINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN ERIC WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171 | £0 | £2 | £27 | £192 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | £981 | £496 | £509 | £489 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND FOSTER GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN PARTICULAR BY: THE PROVISION OF A MEMORIAL WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE BOROUGH OF CHORLEY TO PERPETUATE THE MEMORY OF THE CHORLEY PALS [THE MEN FROM THE LANCASHIRE TOWN OF CHORLEY AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES WHO FOUGHT WORLD WAR ONE (1914 - 1919) AS 'Y' COMPANY OF THE 11TH (SERVICE) BATTALION (ACCRINGTON) EAST LANCASHIRE REGIMENT (COLLECTIVELY AND WIDELY KNOWN AS THE 'ACCRINGTON PALS')]. THE ACQUISITION OF ARTEFACTS AND THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH WITH THE DISSEMINATION OF ANY USEFUL RESULTS.
Area of benefit
LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 St. Thomas's Road
CHORLEY
PR7 1JE
- Phone:
- 01257273313
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window