Financial history BANGLADESHI MENTAL HEALTH FORUM

Charity number: 1128579
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.12k £9.39k £21.91k £24.20k £21.17k
Total expenditure £9.83k £7.12k £16.50k £23.63k £16.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £6.00k N/A
Income from government grants £3.95k N/A £6.00k £6.00k £11.20k