Financial history HEALTHY LIVING PARTNERSHIP (HALIFAX)

Charity Number: 1121688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £875 £375 £730 £730 £2.29k
Total expenditure £447 £627 £943 £943 £2.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A