Financial history PAXCROFT MEAD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1123423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.14k £26.02k £31.51k £29.40k £29.13k
Total expenditure £28.86k £12.84k £34.06k £32.08k £29.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.60k N/A N/A N/A