Financial history VALE ROYAL DISABILITY SERVICES

Charity Number: 1123915
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £81.73k £63.62k £66.62k £35.05k £68.24k
Total expenditure £110.96k £78.87k £80.50k £71.93k £77.41k
Income from government contracts N/A £61.70k £66.09k £35.05k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A