DORSET COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE FOUNDATION WORKS WITH INDIVIDUALS, COMPANIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ASSIST IN DELIVERING THEIR CHARITABLE AIMS, AND DEVELOP LONGER-TERM STRATEGIC PHILANTHROPY PROGRAMMES. THIS WORK ENABLES THE FOUNDATION TO DISTRIBUTE GRANT FUNDING TO DORSET BASED COMMUNITY GROUPS AND CHARITIES THAT PROVIDE SERVICES AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES WITHIN BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE AND ACROSS DORSET.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Bournemouth
  • Dorset
  • Poole

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 December 2007: Standard registration
  • 15 August 2011: Funds received from 1083644 THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR BOURNEMOUTH DORSET AN...
  • 03 November 2014: Funds received from 306232 THE MARRAS PRIZE
  • 07 November 2014: Funds received from 306204-3 FISHER PRIZE FUND
  • 07 November 2014: Funds received from 306204-2 COLFOX ENDOWMENT
  • 07 November 2014: Funds received from 306204-1 JOHN LETTIS SHORT SCHOLARSHIP FUND
  • 07 November 2014: Funds received from 306204 BRIDPORT EDUCATION FOUNDATION
  • 07 November 2014: Funds received from 306162 MARY COFFIN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
  • 25 June 2015: Funds received from 900136 THE SARAH JANE (HUNT) MAY'S DOMESTIC STUDIES AND H...
  • 05 May 2016: Funds received from 295144 THE E D CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 16 February 2017: Funds received from 1076524 TOBY'S - SHAFTESBURY YOUNG PEOPLE'S PROJECT
  • 12 April 2021: Funds received from 1013298 DAVID ALFORD COLLINS CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR BOURNEMOUTH DORSET AND POOLE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Howard Trustee 07 March 2025
None on record
Neil Lewis Trustee 07 March 2025
None on record
Martha Searle Trustee 24 March 2023
None on record
Jenifer Anne Richardson Trustee 24 March 2023
SURFERS AGAINST SEWAGE
Received: On time
Rebecca Stalker Trustee 09 December 2022
None on record
Lee Hardy Trustee 09 December 2022
None on record
Nick Lee Trustee 17 June 2022
None on record
Louise Hazel Coulton Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Terry Standing Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Deborah Appleby Trustee 14 December 2020
UK COMMUNITY FOUNDATIONS
Received: On time
Tom Nicholas Flood Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £633.78k £1.68m £923.43k £1.12m £1.34m
Total expenditure £683.64k £1.75m £1.03m £1.32m £1.27m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £106.37k £150.00k £162.00k £397.60k £528.17k
Income - Donations and legacies £294.82k £519.74k £1.83m £1.08m £700.77k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £255.67k £1.14m £449.71k £577.78k £651.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £58.23k £1.44m £626.49k £163.67k
Income - Investment £83.29k £79.72k £79.94k £94.08k £153.15k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £230.93k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £675.89k £1.74m £1.02m £1.32m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.75k £15.30k £8.93k £8.66k £16.38k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £6.72k £7.16k £7.90k £10.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £302.20k £1.30m £660.84k £865.61k £790.42k
Expenditure - Investment management £7.75k £15.30k £8.93k £8.66k £16.38k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £565 £2.52k £2.65k £2.09k £839
Long-term investments £2.48m £2.96m £3.03m £3.07m £4.36m
Other assets £281.19k £376.60k £1.87m £2.10m £2.25m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £42.27k £75.57k £85.21k £50.56k £939.22k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DORSET COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
The Spire
High Street
POOLE
BH15 1DF
Phone:
01202670815