Financial history RFU INJURED PLAYERS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.08m £518.72k £1.99m £1.81m £1.18m
Total expenditure £1.09m £781.06k £913.65k £1.94m £1.91m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £343.26k £224.54k £1.63m £1.49m £841.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £366.52k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £372.12k £294.18k £354.23k £322.00k £343.16k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £856.84k £671.01k £780.97k £1.80m £1.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £228.69k £110.05k £132.68k £144.23k £151.15k
Expenditure - Governance £35.01k £9.56k £21.25k £159.25k £178.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £192.38k £140.04k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £59.75k £10.28k £9.96k £10.27k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0