Financial history THE ASHMORE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £331.37k £343.82k £1.48m £950.87k £980.32k
Total expenditure £281.55k £158.74k £343.35k £537.04k £427.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £1.22m £736.93k £692.59k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £269.25k £213.94k £287.72k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £342.57k £519.38k £394.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £782 £15.78k £27.63k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £21.30k £18.80k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £301.36k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £1.89k £4.80k