Governance Northwich RUFC
Charity number: 1122898

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 20 February 2008: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 February 2011: Standard registration
- 09 October 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 November 2018: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- NORTHWICH RUFC JUNIORS (Working name)
- NORTHWICH YOUTH DEVELOPMENT RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.