OPERA NORTH FUTURE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has been established primarily to support the activities of Opera North Limited and to encourage and support its artistic aspirations and developmental initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA HELEN BLETCHER | Chair | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
Virginia Lloyd | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Laura Frances Canning | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Campbell | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL ANTHONY LEE | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £546.95k | £253.82k | £234.84k | £184.81k | £137.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £574.18k | £67.91k | £370.67k | £243.62k | £323.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £500.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £46.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £522.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £51.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £425.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £13.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
2.2 TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF OPERA NORTH LIMITED (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 511726 AND REGISTERED COMPANY NUMBER 1550778) FOR THE BENEFIT OF OPERA NORTH LIMITED IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT RESTRICTION, TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT ITS ARTISTIC ASPIRATIONS AND DEVELOPMENTAL INITIATIVES.
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Howard Opera Centre
8 Harrison Street
LEEDS
LEEDS
LS1 6PA
- Phone:
- 01132233534
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window