Governing document PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT FEDERATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 25/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY PROSTATE CANCER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1 ASSISTING AND STRENGTHENING THE ACTIVITIES IN SUPPORT OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY PROSTATE CANCER, INCLUDING ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING THE FORMATION OF NEW LOCAL PROSTATE SUPPORT ORGANISATIONS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM; 2 ENCOURAGING THE IMPROVEMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES AVAILABLE TO PROSTATE CANCER PATIENTS 3 ACTING AS A FOCUS FOR AND EXPRESSING THE VIEWS OF PATIENT-LED SUPPORT GROUPS CONCERNING: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF PROSTATE CANCER: B) IMPROVING THE HEALTH SERVICES AVAILABLE TO PROSTATE CANCER PATIENTS; AND C) PRIORITIES FOR RESEARCH INTO THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PROSTATE CANCER.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.