Financial history MKGU ROTARY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1123307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.17k £7.15k £15.59k £12.39k £17.53k
Total expenditure £15.08k £8.74k £13.08k £9.73k £19.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A