Financial history SHAW MEADES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1124152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.05k £4.62k £8.07k £5.10k £6.38k
Total expenditure £13.48k £5.56k £22.08k £17.50k £14.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A