Accounts and annual returns THE ELIZABETH FARMOR TRUST

Charity number: 1123825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 March 2025 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 October 2022 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required