SUDBURY AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our service helps people resolve their money, legal and other problems by providing information and advice and by influencing policy makers. This service is independent and provides free, confidential and impartial advice to everyone regardless of race, gender, disability, sexual orientation, religion, age or nationality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £146,668 from 18 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 04 April 2008: Standard registration
- SUDBURY AND SOUTH SUFFOLK CITIZENS ADVICE LIMITED (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Michael Pieczka | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Alexander James Martin | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Piers Bellingham Astley Roberts | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Elizabeth Bartlett | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Sweeny | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Pearson Watts | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.49k | £352.65k | £285.20k | £251.14k | £214.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.84k | £264.15k | £276.71k | £275.25k | £265.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £70.31k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £144.79k | £108.11k | £100.72k | £123.93k | £146.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUDBURY AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH 0F SUDBURY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KEYSE HOUSE
ACTON LANE
SUDBURY
CO10 1QN
- Phone:
- 01787321403
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window