Financial history DERBY COUNTY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1123520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.28m £2.54m £3.60m £3.34m £3.87m
Total expenditure £3.01m £2.46m £3.20m £3.40m £4.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £781.46k
Income from government grants £693.22k £784.46k £719.31k £601.12k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £87.78k £112.78k £0 £0 £70.93k
Income - Other trading activities £115.86k £11.99k £326.10k £121.58k £332.57k
Income - Charitable activities £3.07m £2.42m £3.27m £3.22m £3.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £71.43k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £112.78k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.92m £2.40m £2.91m £3.28m £3.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £90.50k £61.36k £288.92k £111.53k £190.57k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £627.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0