KIDS IN MUSEUMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Visitor led organisation that works with museums throughout the UK to make them more welcoming of all families, children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £176,346 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vanessa Eke | Chair | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Mary Clare Thomas | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Guy Russell Turton | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Brodie | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joe Rattray | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Inger Margareta Lister | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Joseph Bogle | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Brian Marden | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Morrigan Mason | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Kuhn | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Pinnington | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Brisbin | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth McKay | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.21k | £215.55k | £215.23k | £242.89k | £235.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.66k | £198.73k | £220.48k | £243.35k | £251.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £190.00k | £175.04k | £180.80k | £176.99k | £176.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUL 2016 as amended on 08 Aug 2018 as amended on 08 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS AND SCIENCES IN MUSEUMS, GALLERIES, SCHOOLS AND OTHER PLACES OF FORMAL AND INFORMAL LEARNING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4TH FLOOR
SILVERSTREAM HOUSE
45 FITZROY STREET
LONDON
W1T 6EB
- Phone:
- 07709 010273
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window