VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DISABILITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A membership body representing organisations within the voluntary sector who work alongside disabled people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£512,488
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £489.31k | |
Other trading activities | £15.10k | |
Investments | £8.08k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£534,499
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £534.50k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £534.50k |
People

5 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Dickson | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Veevers | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Murphy | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Heritage | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna McEwen | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Ufuoma Sobowale | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hampson | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Land | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Azra Kirkby | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Shad | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £435.37k | £512.56k | £438.61k | £494.05k | £512.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £389.51k | £452.32k | £421.32k | £511.33k | £534.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £39.67k | £55.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £15.10k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £508.27k | N/A | N/A | £489.31k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £4.29k | N/A | N/A | £8.08k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £452.32k | N/A | N/A | £534.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £12.53k | N/A | N/A | £2.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £2.81k | N/A | N/A | £34.36k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £559.66k | N/A | N/A | £499.43k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £67.90k | N/A | N/A | £61.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 SEPTEMBER 2008 as amended on 14 Nov 2019 as amended on 29 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE:- TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT VOLUNTARY SECTOR PROVIDERS OF SOCIAL CARE SUPPORT SERVICES TO DISABLED PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) LIASING BETWEEN CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENT AGENCIES AND OTHER GROUPS ON RELEVANT ISSUES; (B) EDUCATING AND UNDERTAKING RESEARCH IN RELATION TO THE PROVISION AND FINANCING OF SOCIAL CARE SERVICES AND/OR OTHER SUPPORT FOR DISABLED PEOPLE BY VOLUNTARY AND CHARITABLE PROVIDERS; (C ) IDENTIFYING NEEDS IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND ESTABLISHING PROJECTS OR POLICIES TO ADDRESS THEM; (D) ACTING AS A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR IN RELATION TO GOVERNMENT POLICIES AND LEGISLATION; (E) PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL CARE AND/OR OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES FOR DISABLED PEOPLE BY VOLUNTARY AND CHARITABLE PROVIDERS; WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING THE INDEPENDENCE OF DISABLED PEOPLE WHO ARE RECEIVING OR WHO MAY REQUIRE SOCIAL CARE SERVICES AND/OR OTHER SUPPORT. 'THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. = CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. = VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6th Floor
2 London Wall Place
London
EC2Y 5AU
- Phone:
- 0330 043 1273
- Email:
- info@vodg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window