FRIENDS OF THE CHAPEL OF SAINT LAWRENCE, WARMINSTER (FOCSL)

Charity Number: 1124072
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting the feoffees of the chapel in maintaining , refurbishing and beautifying the chapel. Variety of fund raising and community activities organised -concerts, sales etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022

Total income: £1,173
Total expenditure: £656

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 2008: Standard registration
  • 26 July 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 26 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1194628 ST LAWRENCE CHAPEL WARMINSTER
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £1.48k £1.48k £614 £610 £1.17k
Total expenditure £4.24k £4.24k £300 £300 £656
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 March 2022 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required