TRELIX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making to charitable organisations for charitable purposes. Unfortunately we are not able to consider applications from individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Robert Adeane Hanning | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Christopher William Arthur Hanning | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CAROLINE BALDWIN WALKER | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM EGERTON BENWELL | Trustee | 25 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH RUTH INMAN HANNING | Trustee | 25 March 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.20k | £57.19k | £53.06k | £51.42k | £59.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.21k | £127.06k | £354.44k | £62.81k | £96.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
2.2 TO MAKE DONATIONS TOWARDS OR OTHERWISE TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT. 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLANDY & BLANDY
1 FRIAR STREET
READING
RG1 1DA
- Phone:
- 01189516800
- Email:
- TrelixCT@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window