THE COLLEGE OF SAINT MARY OF WINCHESTER IN OXFORD, COMMONLY CALLED NEW COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education, learning and research; and the advancement of religion (in that the College is a choral college in accordance with the Founder's intentions and hence it sustains a Choir and a Choir School).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£22,066,000
Donations and legacies | £5.31m | |
Charitable activities | £11.47m | |
Other trading activities | £345.00k | |
Investments | £4.93m | |
Other | £10.00k |
Total expenditure:
£21,185,000
Raising funds | £1.01m | |
Charitable activities | £20.17m | |
Other | £0 |
£13,569,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.01m | |
Charitable expenditure | £20.17m | |
Retained for future use | £881.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.01m | |
Charitable expenditure | £20.17m | |
Retained for future use | £14.45m |
People

745 Employee(s)
52 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 13 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 July 2011: Standard registration
- NEW COLLEGE (Working name)
- NEW COLLEGE IN OXFORD (Working name)
- NEW COLLEGE OXFORD (Working name)
- THE COLLEGE OF SAINT MARY OF WINCHESTER IN OXFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
52 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Cohen | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Thomas Murphy | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Margarita Vaysman | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Christian Sahner | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Bernhard Malkmus | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Polly Louise Waite | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Peter Boxall | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Meera Sabaratnam | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Paola Conconi | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Elena Baena-Gonzalez | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Stephan Uphoff | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Natalia Ares | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Jean-Paul Carvalho | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Jeanne Morefield | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Shivaji Sondhi | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Robert Hepach | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Barbara Rossi | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Prof Nino Luraghi | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Gerald Wells | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Miles Young | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Robert Quinney | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Andrew Meadows | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Grant Churchill | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MASUD HUSAIN | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev ERICA LONGFELLOW | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
MARK CURTIS | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr HANNAH SULLIVAN | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor JOSEPH CONLON | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
JANE LIGHTFOOT | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor ANDREI ZORIN | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor MARI SAKO | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor VOLKER HALBACH | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor RICHARD WHITTINGTON | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor STEPHEN MULHALL | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
JONATHAN BLACK | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
ROSALIND TEMPLE | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor DAVID PARROTT | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR MARCUS DU SAUTOY | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor OLIVER PYBUS | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr MARK GRIFFITH | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor JOHN MCGRADY | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DR M J BURDEN | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Professor EUGENE FLYNN | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor SUSAN BRIGHT | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID PALFREYMAN | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr WILLIAM POOLE | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Professor MARTIN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor DIETER HELM | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor TIMOTHY WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ADRIANNE SLYZ | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor DAVID GAVAGHAN | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr RICHARD MASH | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.33m | £15.99m | £17.80m | £20.02m | £21.75m | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.13m | £16.61m | £16.93m | £21.34m | £21.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.52m | £3.90m | £7.16m | £4.11m | £5.31m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £214.00k | £110.00k | £9.00k | £180.00k | £345.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.36m | £7.98m | £8.03m | £9.91m | £11.47m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £73.00k | £970.00k | £1.20m | £146.00k | £318.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.31m | £4.32m | £3.10m | £5.93m | £4.93m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £660.00k | £694.00k | £42.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £187.00k | £824.30k | £281.64k | £424.05k | £241.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £18.89m | £15.81m | £16.17m | £20.46m | £20.17m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.24m | £807.00k | £758.00k | £876.00k | £1.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.00k | £27.00k | £35.00k | £0 | £43.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £222.00k | £17.43k | £226.04k | £266.48k | £291.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £666.00k | £262.00k | £245.00k | £317.00k | £406.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £47.56m | £51.20m | £53.79m | £69.45m | £98.35m | |
|
Long-term investments | £257.51m | £239.48m | £290.65m | £296.26m | £277.36m | |
|
Other assets | £6.53m | £4.30m | £9.24m | £6.92m | £10.62m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£3.60m | -£2.55m | -£2.17m | -£4.34m | -£3.40m | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.66m | £2.24m | £3.83m | £4.98m | £5.17m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 August 2020 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 16 August 2020 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF FOUNDATION DATED 26 NOVEMBER 1379 AND STATUTES LAST AMENDED INCORPORATED INTO THE STATUTES 20 MAY 2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW COLLEGE
HOLYWELL STREET
OXFORD
OX1 3BN
- Phone:
- 01865279500
- Email:
- BURSAR@NEW.OX.AC.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window