Financial history PSHE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1127056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.36m £1.29m £1.37m £1.55m £1.59m
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.06m £1.23m £1.51m £1.76m
Income from government contracts £116.80k N/A N/A £77.36k £25.54k
Income from government grants N/A £13.71k N/A £40.50k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £13.76k £0 £100 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.36m £1.27m £1.37m £1.55m £1.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £344 £604 £126 £77 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.06m £1.23m £1.51m £1.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £33.87k £33.08k £0 £53.40k £79.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0