Financial history CROYDON HARRIERS (ATHLETICS CLUB)

Charity number: 1125648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £40.49k £13.40k £7.96k £23.66k £22.98k
Total expenditure £22.81k £13.10k £5.26k £17.68k £19.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A